EP4095979 - BATTERY MODULE, POWER SUPPLY DEVICE COMPRISING BATTERY MODULE, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE COMPRISING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNIMITSU Tomonori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA Masato c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YANO Junya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
HAMADA Taisuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20916065.4 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020JP34803 | Priority number, date | JP20200009519 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020009519 | [2022/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149300 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095979 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H01M50/20, H01M50/30, H01M50/50, H02J7/02, B60L50/60, B60L58/10, B60L53/60, H01M50/249, H02J7/00, H02J9/06, H01M10/42, H01M50/209, H01M50/284, H01M50/298, H01M50/35, H01M50/569 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP);
B60L50/64 (US);
B60L53/14 (US);
B60L53/66 (US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/46 (US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H01M50/284 (EP);
H01M50/298 (EP);
H01M50/3425 (US);
H01M50/35 (EP);
H01M50/367 (US);
H01M50/569 (EP);
H02J7/0014 (US);
H02J7/0063 (US);
H02J7/007 (US);
H01M10/4257 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J3/322 (EP);
H02J9/06 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H01M50/20, H01M50/30, H01M50/50, H02J7/02, B60L50/60, B60L58/10, B60L53/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL, STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM BATTERIEMODUL SOWIE ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG UND ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | BATTERY MODULE, POWER SUPPLY DEVICE COMPRISING BATTERY MODULE, AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE COMPRISING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE, DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION COMPRENANT LE MODULE DE BATTERIE, ET VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE COMPRENANT LE DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | Translation filed | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 04.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011206948 (ASAI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0060]; figure 9 *; | [XYI]US2012161677 (KUNIMITSU TOMONORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10-13 * column 0076 - column 0133; figures 1-5,11,12 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 9; | [Y]US9444086 (SHIMIZU HIDEO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5 * column 13, line 64 - column 14, line 28 ** column 16, line 18 - line 31 * | International search | [XY]JP2011175743 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-7 * [0019]-[0031], [0055]-[0067], 9, 21-23 * [Y] 7-13; | [Y]JP2013051856 (SONY CORP) [Y] 8-13* [0061]-[0074], 15-19 *; | [XY]JP2013168357 (LITHIUM ENERGY JAPAN KK) [X] 1-6 * [0031], [0073], [0087], [0106]-[0111], [0125]-[0126], 3-4, 14-15, 19-20 * [Y] 7-13 | by applicant | WO2014024452 |