EP4095467 - SHELF ASSEMBLY AND STORAGE CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hefei Hualing Co., Ltd. No. 176 Jinxiu Road Hefei Economic and Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | For all designated states Hefei Midea Refrigerator Co., Ltd. No. 669 West Changjiang Road Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Nanfei No. 176 Jin Xiu Road, Hefei Economic And Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Feng No. 176 Jin Xiu Road, Hefei Economic And Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Yunho No. 176 Jin Xiu Road, Hefei Economic And Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20916082.9 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020CN129752 | Priority number, date | CN20201065228 | 20.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010065228 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021147495 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095467 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25D25/02, F25D11/00, A47B96/02, B65G1/02, A47B57/06 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A47B57/06 (EP,KR);
F25D25/024 (KR);
F25D25/02 (CN);
A47B57/18 (US);
A47B96/025 (EP);
A47F3/00 (US);
A47F3/0486 (EP,KR);
F25D11/00 (CN,KR);
F25D25/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | F25D25/02, F25D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | REGALANORDNUNG UND LAGERSCHRANK | [2022/48] | English: | SHELF ASSEMBLY AND STORAGE CABINET | [2022/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉTAGÈRE ET ARMOIRE DE STOCKAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2022 | Translation filed | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN206600978U (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD); | [XAI]KR101878436B |