EP4098667 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED POLYDIENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Public Joint Stock Company "Sibur Holding" (PJSC "Sibur Holding") Eastern Industrial Area Building 30, Block 1 N 6 Tyumen Region Tobolsk, 626150 / RU | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IARTSEVA, Tatiana Aleksandrovna ul. Mopra, 19/1 kv. 134 g. Voronezh, 394033 / RU | 02 /
LAGUNOVA, Svetlana Alekseevna Leninsky prospekt, 9/2 kv. 3 g. Voronezh, 394029 / RU | 03 /
ARTEMEVA, Olga Ivanovna Volzhskaya ul., 52-a kv. 49 g. Voronezh, 394008 / RU | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Peters, Andreas Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 20916328.6 | 29.01.2020 | [2022/49] | WO2020RU00042 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154112 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | RU | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098667 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08F36/04, C08F36/06, C08F136/06, C08F4/52, C08F4/44, C08F4/42, C08K5/5415, C08C19/25, C08C19/44, C08L15/00, C08L9/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C08F136/06 (EP);
C08C19/25 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F136/06, C08F4/54 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L15/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEN POLYDIENEN | [2022/49] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED POLYDIENES | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYDIÈNES MODIFIÉS | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | Translation filed | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2101616 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1972644 (OTKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHEST [RU]); | [A]US2010216956 (LUO STEVEN [US], et al) | International search | [A]RU2392284 (DZHEJ EHS EHR CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3, 26-29* , the claims, the abstract *; | [XA]RU2675540 (PUBLICHNOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO SIBUR KHOLDING [RU]) [X] 26-29 * , p. 10, lines 10-16, p. 10, line 46 - p. 12, line 47, p. 13, line 44 - p. 14, line 11, example 2, table 1-3 * [A] 1-3 | by applicant | US6624256 | US7112632 | RU2475503 | RU2569673 | - Vysokomolekulnye soedinenie, (20150000), no. 3, pages 8 - 10 |