EP4097069 - A FERTILIZER GRANULE OF POLYHALITE AND POTASSIUM SULPHATE AND A COMPACTION PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICL Europe Cooperatief U.A. Koningin Wilhelminaplein 30 1062 KR Amsterdam / NL | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABU-RABEAH, Khalil Makhol, Abu Rabeah Center, 1/1 84106 Beer Sheva / IL | 02 /
SOCOLOVSKY, Ruben I.L. Peretz 1 Beer Sheva / IL | 03 /
DAKOV, Marina Etrog 27/24 Arad / IL | 04 /
LEVY, Yacov Tel Lachish 4/60 St. Dimona / IL | 05 /
GEINIK, Natalia Tapuah 3/13 Arad / IL | 06 /
GOLDFARB, Moshe Ymit 21 Beer Sheva / IL | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Maslanka Kubik, Dorota Irena MGM Patentes y Marcas c/Vara de Rey 5 TER, 3, Of. 5 26003 Logroño (La Rioja) / ES | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 20917079.4 | 28.12.2020 | [2022/49] | WO2020IL51339 | Priority number, date | US202062966099P | 27.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062966099 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152573 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097069 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C05D1/02, C05D9/02, C05D1/04, C05G5/12, B01J2/28, C05G3/00, B01J2/00, C05D5/00, C05D1/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
C05D1/005 (EP,IL,US);
C05D1/02 (EP,IL);
C05D1/04 (EP,IL);
C05D5/00 (EP,IL);
C05D9/00 (IL);
C05D9/02 (EP,IL);
C05F11/00 (IL);
C05G3/00 (EP);
C05G5/12 (EP,IL,US);
C05G5/40 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C05D1/02, C05D5/00, C05D9/00, C05F11/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | C05D1/00, C05D9/02, C05D1/04, C05G5/12, B01J2/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | DÜNGEMITTELGRANULAT AUS POLYHALIT UND KALIUMSULFAT UND VERDICHTUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/49] | English: | A FERTILIZER GRANULE OF POLYHALITE AND POTASSIUM SULPHATE AND A COMPACTION PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2022/49] | French: | GRANULÉ D'ENGRAIS COMPRENANT DU POLYHALITE ET DE SULFATE DE POTASSIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPACTAGE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018229757 (CLEVELAND POTASH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * page 10, lines 1-3; claims 1,2 * * page 6, lines 1-7, 21-23 * * page 7, lines 1-5, 6-15 * * page 8, lines 18-20 * * page 5, lines 18-23 *; | [X]DE102017125467 (K S AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0035] *; | [XP]WO2020105057 (ICL EUROPE COOPERATIEF UA [NL]) [XP] 1-9 * page 3, lines 19-20 * * page 13, lines 7-9 * * page 5, lines 8-10 * * page 7, lines 1-6, 18-24 * * page 8, lines 1-3, 4-13 * * page 4, lines 7-9 * * page 6, lines 20-24 *; | [E]WO2021033178 (ICL EUROPE COOPERATIEF UA [NL]) [E] 1-7 * page 3, lines 21-23 * * page 5, lines 1-3 * * page 4, lines 1-2 * * page 15, lines 3-5, 6-8 ** page 12, lines 12-14 *; | [E]WO2021137204 (ICL EUROPE COOPERATIEF UA [NL]) [E] 1-7 * page 10; example 2 * * page 2, lines 3-8 * | International search | [X]WO2018229757 (CLEVELAND POTASH LTD [GB]) [X] 8,9 * p. 5 line 3, p. 5 line 9, p. 4 lines 10-11, p.6 lines 6-7, p. 7 line 1, p. 7 lines 3-5, p. 7 lines 6-16 *; | [X]WO2019016804 (CLEVELAND POTASH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7* summary of invention, p. 10 lines 19-21, example 5, p. 10 lines 19-21, p. 8 line 13, p. 9 lines 12-13, p. 8 lines 16-22 * |