Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022374976 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP37572 | 02.10.2020 | JP2020020041 | 07.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115053250 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP37572 | 02.10.2020 | JP2020020041 | 07.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4102442 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | A4 | EP4102442 | 14.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP37572 | 02.10.2020 | JP2020020041 | 07.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021157132 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020020041 | 07.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021125135 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020020041 | 07.02.2020 |