EP4102188 - ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI Tatsuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA Hiroko c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MATSUNAGA Toshihiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
KUBO Kenta c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 20917822.7 | 06.02.2020 | [2022/50] | WO2020JP04520 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157000 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102188 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102188 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20, G01D5/244 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP,US);
G01D5/2046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | G01D5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINKELERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/50] | English: | ANGLE DETECTION DEVICE | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ANGLE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2022 | Translation filed | 01.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2012145371 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract, Desc. [0015]-[0024], [0028]-[0090], Figs. 1-15 *; | [XI]US2014316733 (MORI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * Abstract, Desc. [0027]-[0046], Figs. 1-3 * [I] 2-14; | [Y]JP2015040806 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract, Desc. [0001]-[0006], [0011]-[0012], Figs. 1-2 *; | [E]EP3916361 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1* Abstract, Desc. [0012]-[0129], Figs. 1-14 *; | [E]EP4063799 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * Abstract, Desc. [0013]-[0047], Figs. 1-15 * | International search | [YA]JP2012145371 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0015]-[0024], [0028]-[0090], fig. 1-15 * [A] 5-14; | [A]WO2013035735 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0087], fig. 1-15 *; | [YA]JP2015040806 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0006], [0011], [0012], fig. 1, 2 * [A] 5-14; | [A]US2016109269 (PARK JOO YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* , paragraphs [0038]-[0059], fig. 1-3 *; | [A]JP2018205112 (MABUCHI MOTOR CO) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0060], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2019124514 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0054], fig. 1-7 * | by applicant | JP2000018968 | WO2019123592 | - MORI, KOJIMAKIMPARA, NAKANO, "High Precision On-line Offset Correction for Motor Angle Sensors", Institute of Electrical Engineers of Japan Transactions on Industry Applications, (20160000), vol. 136, no. 8 | - KURISHIGE et al., "A New Control Strategy to Reduce Steering Torque for Vehicles Equipped with Electric Power Steering", Transactions of the Japan Society of Mechanical Engineers, vol. 68, page 675 |