EP4104585 - SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK LOCATION FOR FRAME BASED EQUIPMENT MODE IN CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Changlong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 20919301.0 | 14.02.2020 | [2022/51] | WO2020CN75187 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021159434 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104585 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L27/26, H04L5/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP);
H04L5/0082 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALBLOCKORTUNG FÜR FRAME-BASIERTEN GERÄTEMODUS IN DER MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATION | [2022/51] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK LOCATION FOR FRAME BASED EQUIPMENT MODE IN CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/51] | French: | EMPLACEMENT DE BLOC DE SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION POUR UN MODE ÉQUIPEMENT BASÉ SUR DES TRAMES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRES | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Qualcomm Incorporated", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, CN; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911098 7.2.2.2.2 INITIAL ACCESS AND MOBILITY PROCEDURES FOR NR-U, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOL, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1911098.zip R1-1911098 7.2.2.2.2 Initial access and mobility procedures for NR-U.docx, (20191005), XP051808837 [A] 1-15 * page 2 * | [T] - ZTE ET AL, "Remaining issues on channel access procedure for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191109), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1911822, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_99/Docs/R1-1911822.zip R1-1911822_Remaining issues on channel access procedure for NR-U.docx, (20191109), XP051823016 [T] * paragraph [02.7] * | [XP] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Qualcomm Incorporated", vol. RAN WG1, no. 20200224 - 20200306, (20200215), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2000957, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_100_e/Docs/R1-2000957.zip R1-2000957 7.2.2.2.2 TP for Initial access and mobility procedures for NR-U.docx, (20200215), XP051853532 [XP] 1-13 * page 5 - page 6 * | International search | [A]CN110167134 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) [A] 1-77* the whole document *; | [A]US2020037354 (LI YINGZHE [US], et al) [A] 1-77 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020032725 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-77 * the whole document * |