Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
11.08.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
11.08.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
24.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
20.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
22.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.08.2021 | Change - representative | |
27.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |