Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11963092 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B2 | US2022322213 | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN102638 | 17.07.2020 | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7273180B | Global Dossier | 12.05.2023 | B2 | JP2022541085 | 22.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN102638 | 17.07.2020 | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4164326 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A4 | EP4164326 | 12.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN102638 | 17.07.2020 | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021248629 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111405684B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B | CN111405684 | 10.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 |