EP4164326 - METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR CONNECTION TO NETWORK ACCESS DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chengdu Xgimi Technology Co., Ltd Building 4, Zone A Tianfu Software Park No. 1129 Century City Road High-Tech Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hao Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Fang Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 03 /
LIAO, Yang Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 20919390.3 | 17.07.2020 | [2023/15] | WO2020CN102638 | Priority number, date | CN202010509506 | 08.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010509506 | [2023/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021248629 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164326 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10, H04W76/19 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W76/19 (EP,CN);
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSCHLUSS AN EINE NETZZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄT UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/15] | English: | METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR CONNECTION TO NETWORK ACCESS DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL DE CONNEXION À UN DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS AU RÉSEAU, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2021 | Translation filed | 27.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2021 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020077350 (GIDVANI RAVI [US], et al); |