EP4108908 - MAIN BEAM FOR FAN BLADE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envision Energy Co., Ltd. No. 3 Shenzhuang Road, Shengang Street Jiangyin Wuxi Jiangsu 214443 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Yuan No.3 Shenzhuang Road, Shengang Street, Jiangyin Wuxi, Jiangsu 214443 / CN | 02 /
OVERGAARD, Lars No.3 Shenzhuang Road, Shengang Street, Jiangyin Wuxi, Jiangsu 214443 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Jianxu No.3 Shenzhuang Road, Shengang Street, Jiangyin Wuxi, Jiangsu 214443 / CN | 04 /
ZHUANG, Lei No.3 Shenzhuang Road, Shengang Street, Jiangyin Wuxi, Jiangsu 214443 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Miao, Tianhao Nymphenburger Straße 6a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20919545.2 | 18.02.2020 | [2022/52] | WO2020CN75678 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163875 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108908 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
B29C70/16 (EP);
B29C70/52 (US);
B29D99/0025 (EP);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29L2031/085 (EP,US);
F05B2230/30 (US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | HAUPTTRÄGER FÜR VENTILATORSCHAUFEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/52] | English: | MAIN BEAM FOR FAN BLADE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/52] | French: | PROFILÉ PRINCIPAL POUR PALE DE VENTILATEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | Translation filed | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 14.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013340385 (HAYDEN PAUL TREVOR [GB], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042]; figure 4 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 2-6; | [Y]EP2778393 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; figures 5-7 *; | [Y]US2017218918 (CIESLAK CHRIS [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0041] , [0057] - [0063]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]CN108284623 (JIANGSU JINFENG SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN103817955 (SINOMATECH WIND POWER BLADE CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]CN106401865 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2017082089 (YARBROUGH AARON A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2018058422 (YARBROUGH AARON A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [X]CN108284623 (JIANGSU JINFENG SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * description, paragraphs 21-38 and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN109098929 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]CN109094075 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-17* entire document * |