EP4104793 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT HOLDING DEVICE AND SURGERY ASSISTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 8-1-22 Akasaka Minato-ku 1070052 Tokyo / JP | [2023/24] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 20 Samon-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1600017 / JP | ||
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states Riverfield Inc. NMF Aoyama 1-chome Building 8-1-22 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIHARA, Teruyuki c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 20919748.2 | 20.02.2020 | [2022/51] | WO2020JP06887 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021166185 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104793 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4104793 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/50, A61B34/35 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
A61B34/35 (EP);
A61B2017/00398 (US);
A61B2017/00486 (US);
A61B2090/506 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | A61B34/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE UND OPERATIONSHILFSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT HOLDING DEVICE AND SURGERY ASSISTING DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTEUR D'INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL ET DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE CHIRURGICALE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2022 | Translation filed | 15.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012296159 (KANAZAWA NORIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US2017296040 (HARAGUCHI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-7B *; | [A]JP2019037658 (HOGI MEDICAL KK, et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]WO2016051494 (RIVERFIELD INC [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2017513552 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS) [A] 1-8* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2020005784 (RIVERFIELD INC) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings * |