Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
12.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.04.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
29.07.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
21.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
27.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.08.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |