Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023042168 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN101986 | 15.07.2020 | CN202010101797 | 19.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4049987 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | A4 | EP4049987 | 31.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN101986 | 15.07.2020 | CN202010101797 | 19.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021164191 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010101797 | 19.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111362685B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2021 | B | CN111362685 | 03.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010101797 | 19.02.2020 |