EP4113069 - RESOLVER ABNORMALITY DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Tatsuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Hiroko c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MATSUNAGA, Toshihiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
KUBO, Kenta c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 20922332.0 | 26.02.2020 | [2023/01] | WO2020JP07582 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021171391 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113069 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4113069 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20, G01D5/244 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G01D5/24461 (EP);
G01R31/72 (US);
G01B7/30 (US);
G01D5/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR RESOLVERANOMALIEN | [2023/01] | English: | RESOLVER ABNORMALITY DETECTION DEVICE | [2023/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ANOMALIE DE RÉSOLVEUR | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | Translation filed | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0972758 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,13,14 * Abstract, Desc. [0013]-[0023], Figs. 1-5 * [A] 3-5,8,9,11,12; | [A]JP2006177750 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP2159548 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YA]JP2012098188 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,13,14 * Abstract, Desc. [0017]-[0038], Figs. 1-7 * [A] 3-5,8,9,11,12; | [YA]JP2013257284 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,13,14 * Abstract, Desc. [0002], [0005], [0009], [0025]-[0035], Figs. 1-13 * [A] 3-5,8,9,11,12; | [YA]WO2019123592 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 13 * Abstract, Desc. [0013]-[0042], Figs. 1-9, 17-20 * [A] 1-12,14 | International search | [YA]JPH0972758 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-2, 6-7, 10,13-14 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0023], fig. 1-5, paragraphs [0013]-[0023], fig. 1-5 * [A] 3-5, 8-9, 11-12; | [A]US5644224 (HOWARD DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-14* , column 1, line 54 to column 5, line 35, fig. 1-7 *; | [A]JPH1114691 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-14 * , paragraph [0003] *; | [A]JP2002107179 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0002], [0003], fig. 7, 8 *; | [A]JP2007292697 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0015], fig. 1, 2 *; | [YA]JP2012098188 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-2, 6-7, 10,13-14 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0038], fig. 1-7, paragraphs [0017]-[0038], fig. 1-7 * [A] 3-5, 8-9, 11-12; | [YA]JP2013257284 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [Y] 1-2, 6-7, 10, 13-14 * , paragraphs [0002], [0025]-[0105], fig. 1-13, paragraphs [0002], [0025]-[0105], fig. 1-13 * [A] 3-5, 8-9, 11- 12; | [YA]WO2019123592 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 13 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0042], [0059]-[0069], fig. 1-9, 17-20, paragraphs [0013]-[0042], [0059]-[0069], fig. 1-9, 17-20 * [A] 1-12, 14 | by applicant | JP2000018968 | JP2005147791 | JP2006335252 |