EP3965200 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Limited No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng Zone Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Rui No.1 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20922640.6 | 04.03.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN77771 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174444 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965200 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/48, H01M4/587, H01M10/052, H01M10/0525, H01M50/414, H01M50/417, H01M50/42, H01M50/434, H01M50/446, H01M50/451, H01M4/485 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/622 (CN,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/386 (EP);
H01M4/483 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M50/414 (EP);
H01M50/417 (EP);
H01M50/42 (EP);
H01M50/434 (EP);
H01M50/446 (EP);
H01M50/451 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
H01M4/133 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2022/10] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2022/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | Translation filed | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104471762 (ZEON CORP) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0079] *; | [XI]US2016164065 (LIU CHENMIN [HK], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0042]; figure 1; table 1 * [I] 6-9; | [XI]US2016293920 (JUNG BOKYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] - [0069] - [0070] - [0115] - [0150]; examples 1-6; table 2 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]EP3093906 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0011] - [0022] - [0169] - [0202]; examples 1-35 * [I] 9 | International search | [Y]CN104471762 (ZEON CORP) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraph [0079] *; | [Y]CN105680086 (NANO & ADVANCED MAT INST LTD) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs [0006]-[0045], and figure 1 *; | [A]KR20170059270 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [A]CN108878748 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]CN109075316 (ZEON CORP) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]CN110416467 (BYD CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * entire document * |