EP4119273 - REAMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Tool Net, Inc. 7-28 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Masashi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
JINDAI, Masaaki c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
OKAMOTO, Jun c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOOL NET, INC., 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 04 /
TAKESHITA, Futoshi c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC TOOL NET, INC., 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 05 /
KAI, Kyosuke c/o ASAHI TOOLS MFG. CO., LTD., 261-2, Kitaimaichi 2-chome Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0242 / JP | 06 /
FUKUDA, Katsutoshi c/o ASAHI TOOLS MFG. CO., LTD., 261-2, Kitaimaichi 2-chome Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0242 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 20924546.3 | 10.03.2020 | [2023/03] | WO2020JP10276 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021181518 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119273 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23D77/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
B23D77/00 (EP,US);
B23D2277/2464 (EP,US);
B23D2277/36 (EP);
B23D2277/62 (EP);
B23D77/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | REIBE | [2023/03] | English: | REAMER | [2023/03] | French: | ALÉSOIR | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | Translation filed | 27.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2724120B (OSG MFG) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2005145066 (TAJIMA ITSUROU [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0050] * | International search | [Y]JPH0871845 (OSG MFG) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0031], fig. 1, 2 *; | [Y]JP2006088229 (HITACHI TOOL ENG) [Y] 3 * , paragraph [0014] *; | [A]JP2009039811 (UNIV KUMAMOTO, et al) [A] 1-3; | [Y]JP2010125532 (ALLIED MATERIAL CORP) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraph [0009] *; | [A]JP2017193006 (UNION TOOL KK)[A] 1-3 | by applicant | JP2013035101 |