Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.07.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
12.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
31.03.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Change - classification | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Change - classification | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
14.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
21.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2022 | Change - representative | |
08.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.07.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
08.07.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
06.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
17.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.09.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |