EP3960101 - VIBRATION TYPE REMOVAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Machinery Co., Ltd. 578-2 Zao-Uwano Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2303 / JP | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Satoshi c/o MICRON MACHINERY CO., LTD., 578-2, Zao-Uwano Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2303 / JP | 02 /
MINAGAWA, Yoshihiro c/o MICRON MACHINERY CO., LTD., 578-2, Zao-Uwano Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2303 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hiroki c/o MICRON MACHINERY CO., LTD., 578-2, Zao-Uwano Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2303 / JP | 04 /
SAKAKIBARA, Makoto c/o MICRON MACHINERY CO., LTD., 578-2, Zao-Uwano Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-2303 / JP | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2024/31] |
Former [2022/09] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20924938.2 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020JP17411 | Priority number, date | JP20200040674 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020040674 | [2022/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021181714 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960101 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3960101 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61C3/03, A61C1/05, // A61B17/3207 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
A61C1/052 (EP);
A61C3/03 (EP);
A61B17/320708 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00154 (EP);
A61B2017/320072 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | A61B17/32, A61C3/03, A61C1/05 | ||
Former IPC [2022/09] | A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON SCHWINGUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | VIBRATION TYPE REMOVAL APPARATUS | [2022/09] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉLIMINATION À VIBRATIONS | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | Translation filed | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4832683 (IDEMOTO MORITO [JP], et al); | [I]EP1880689 (OSADA RES INST LTD [JP]); | [I]US2008183109 (BABAEV EILAZ [US]); | [A]US2013123774 (ZADEH HOMAYOUN H [CA]); | [A]CN103431894 (GUILIN WOODPECKER MED INSTR CO); | [A]US2014163595 (WITT DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2016051378 (YOUNG MICHAEL [GB]); | [AD]JP2019088452 (MICRON MACHINERY); | [XI]US10555748 (YATES DAVID C [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPS61159952 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [Y]JPH02286149 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [A]JP2002143177 (MIWATEC KK); | [A]US6632233 (BURGARD GUNTHER [DE]); | [A]JP2009539500 ; | [Y]JP3207943U ; | [Y]JP2017504400 ; | [A]US2017258486 (VERCELLOTTI TOMASO [IT], et al); | [Y]JP2019088452 (MICRON MACHINERY) | by applicant | JP2019088452 |