EP3936700 - CONNECTING MEMBER AND ANTI-THERMAL MISMATCH CONNECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aecc Commercial Aircraft Engine Co., Ltd. No.3998 South Lianhua Road Minhang District Shanghai 200241 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Hongbao Shanghai 200241 / CN | 02 /
LI, Kaiyuan Shanghai 200241 / CN | 03 /
HONG, Zhiliang Shanghai 200241 / CN | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Marchioro, Paolo Studio Bonini S.r.l. Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20924980.4 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020CN132059 | Priority number, date | CN202010392432 | 11.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010392432 | [2022/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021227443 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936700 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936700 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F16B39/24, F01D11/08 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
F16B19/02 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D11/08 (EP);
F01D25/28 (US);
F05D2230/642 (EP);
F05D2240/11 (EP);
F05D2240/14 (US);
F05D2250/15 (EP);
F05D2250/231 (US);
F05D2250/27 (EP);
F05D2250/314 (EP);
F05D2250/711 (US);
F05D2260/36 (EP,US);
F05D2260/38 (EP);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | F01D9/04, F16B39/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT UND VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHUTZ VOR THERMISCHER FEHLANPASSUNG | [2022/02] | English: | CONNECTING MEMBER AND ANTI-THERMAL MISMATCH CONNECTING DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE LIAISON ET DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON ANTI-DÉCALAGE THERMIQUE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | Translation filed | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3379039 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8* figure 29 * |