EP3933110 - CAP BEAM MOUNTING METHOD ACHIEVING MUTUAL CONSTRAINT OF ADJACENT PIER COLUMNS IN PREFABRICATED BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Tiesiju Civil Engineering Group Co., Ltd No. 96, East Wangjiang Road Baohe District Hefei City Anhui 230023 / CN | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states China Tiesiju Civil Engineering Group Inc., Ltd N°. 96, East Wangjiang Road Baohe District Hefei City Anhui 230023 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jiaqing No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Dachuang No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Lijun No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xinghuo No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 05 /
FANG, Shisheng No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 06 /
ZHU, Zhenye No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 07 /
XU, Tao No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 08 /
REN, Hao No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 09 /
XU, Jinmiao No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 10 /
XING, Biao No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | 11 /
ZHANG, Shoufeng No. 488 Dongliu West Road Shushan district Hefei Anhui 230022 / CN | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
WANG, Jiaqing Anhui 230022 / CN | ||
02 /
YAO, Dachuang Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
03 /
JIN, Lijun Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
04 /
XU, Xinghuo Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
05 /
FANG, Shisheng Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
06 /
ZHU, Zhenye Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
07 /
XU, Tao Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
08 /
REN, Hao Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
09 /
XU, Jinmiao Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
10 /
XING, Biao Anhui 230022 / CN | |||
11 /
ZHANG, Shoufeng Anhui 230022 / CN | Representative(s) | Kluin Patent Patentanwälte Kluin Debelius Weber PartG mbB Benrather Schlossallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/01] | Kluin, Jörg-Eden KLUIN PATENT Benrather Schloßallee 111 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20924982.0 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020CN136425 | Priority number, date | CN202010261163 | 03.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010261163 | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196739 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933110 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3933110 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01D21/00, E01D19/00, E01D19/02 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
E01D19/02 (EP,CN,US);
E01D21/00 (EP,CN,US);
E01D19/005 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MONTIEREN EINER KAPPE FÜR EINE VORGEFERTIGTE BRÜCKE | [2022/01] | English: | CAP BEAM MOUNTING METHOD ACHIEVING MUTUAL CONSTRAINT OF ADJACENT PIER COLUMNS IN PREFABRICATED BRIDGE | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DE POUTRE CHEVÊTRE RÉALISANT UNE CONTRAINTE MUTUELLE DE COLONNES DE PILIER ADJACENTES DANS UN PONT PRÉFABRIQUÉ | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | Translation filed | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 17.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106677056 (SHANGHAI URBAN CONSTRUCTION DESIGN & RES INST (GROUP) CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]CN110004821 (UNIV FUZHOU) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]CN110629664 (BEIJING GENERAL MUNICIPAL ENGINEERING DESIGN & RES INSTITUTE CO LTD) [A] 1-8* figures 1,7 * |