EP4093344 - A URINARY SYSTEM MAKING THE INVOLUNTARY EXCRETION OCCURING AFTER COLOSTOMY, ILEOSTOMY AND UROSTOMY VOLUNTARY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGNA MEDIKAL TEKNOLOJI SANAYI VE TICARET ANONIM SIRKETI SANAYI MH. TEKNOPARK BLV. TEKNOPARK 4A No. 1/4A IC KAPI NO. 101 PENDIK ISTANBUL / TR | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/03] | For all designated states Tekeli, Onur Asikveysel Mah. Örneklik Sok. Sehir Isiklari Sit. B Blok K:2 D:9 Atasehir/Istanbul / TR | ||
For all designated states Kursun, Kenan Uskumru Köyü Mah. Ariköy Sit. Akkavak Sok. No:9 Sariyer/Istanbul / TR | |||
For all designated states Er, Özgür Sirinyali Mah. 1250 Sok. Mevlüt Kaymak Apt. 3/4 Muratpasa/Antalya / TR | |||
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Tekeli, Onur Asikveysel Mah. Örneklik Sok. Sehir Isiklari Sit. B Blok K:2 D:9 Atasehir/Istanbul / TR | ||
For all designated states Kursun, Kenan Uskumru Köyü Mah. Ariköy Sit. Akkavak Sok. No:9 Sariyer/Istanbul / TR | |||
For all designated states Er, Özgür Sirinyali Mah. 250 Sok. Mevlüt Kaymak Apt. 3/4 Muratpasa/Antalya / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEKELI, Onur Atasehir/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
KURSUN, Kenan Sanyer/Istanbul / TR | 03 /
ER, Özgür Muratoasa/Antalya / TR | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Gülser Kinali, Zeynep Beta IP Consulting Limited International House 101 King's Cross Road London WC1X 9LP / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/48] | Gülser Kinali, Zeynep Beta IP Consulting Limited International House 24 Holborn Viaduct London, EC1A 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 20925790.6 | 16.03.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020TR50206 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021188061 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093344 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4093344 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61F5/445 (EP);
A61F5/4405 (US);
A61F5/4404 (US);
A61F5/443 (EP);
A61F5/449 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARNSYSTEM, DAS DIE UNFREIWILLIGE AUSSCHEIDUNG NACH KOLOSTOMIE, ILEOSTOMIE UND UROSTOMIE FREIWILLIG MACHT | [2022/48] | English: | A URINARY SYSTEM MAKING THE INVOLUNTARY EXCRETION OCCURING AFTER COLOSTOMY, ILEOSTOMY AND UROSTOMY VOLUNTARY | [2022/48] | French: | SYSTÈME URINAIRE RENDANT VOLONTAIRE L'EXCRÉTION INVOLONTAIRE SE PRODUISANT APRÈS COLOSTOMIE, ILÉOSTOMIE ET UROSTOMIE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011106032 (KRATKY PETER [DE]); | [A]US2013060214 (WILLOUGHBY ALASTAIR [GB], et al); | [A]GB2506353 (HIGGINS ROGER [US], et al); | [XAI]US2018235800 (LEE CHOON KEE [US]) | International search | [A]US3906951 (CHEN JAMES LING); | [A]WO9960959 (WAGNER NELDON C [US]); | [A]WO2011091801 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al); | [A]US2013035654 (FRISKE TIMOTHY A [US]) | by applicant | US2011106032 | US2013060214 | GB2506353 | EP2642958 | US2018235800 | TR201909670 |