EP3933914 - PACKAGING STRUCTURE, ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Fengqun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Kaiwen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
LANG, Fengqun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
LIN, Kaiwen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20926350.8 | 16.04.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020CN85092 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021208006 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933914 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/488, H01L21/60, H01L25/16, H01L23/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP,CN);
H01L23/24 (CN);
H01L23/4334 (EP);
H01L23/49506 (EP);
H01L23/49513 (EP);
H01L23/49531 (EP);
H01L23/49562 (EP);
H01L23/49575 (EP);
H01L23/5385 (EP);
H01L24/11 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L24/33 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L24/742 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L25/071 (EP);
H01L25/16 (CN);
H01L25/18 (EP,CN);
H01L2224/1134 (EP);
H01L2224/1184 (EP);
H01L2224/13124 (EP);
H01L2224/13144 (EP);
H01L2224/13147 (EP);
H01L2224/13155 (EP);
H01L2224/291 (EP);
H01L2224/29199 (EP);
H01L2224/293 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,CN);
H01L2224/33181 (EP);
H01L2224/45124 (EP);
H01L2224/45147 (EP);
H01L2224/45565 (EP);
H01L2224/45624 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/83101 (EP);
H01L2224/83139 (EP);
H01L2224/8314 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83192 (EP);
H01L2224/83385 (EP);
H01L2224/83447 (EP);
H01L2224/83801 (EP);
H01L2224/85447 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L23/36 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/45 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13124, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00013 (EP);
H01L2224/13144, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00013 (EP);
H01L2224/13147, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00013 (EP);
H01L2224/13155, H01L2924/013, H01L2924/00013 (EP);
H01L2224/29199, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/291, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/293, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/45565, H01L2224/45147, H01L2224/45624 (EP);
H01L2224/45624, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/83447, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/85447, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSTRUKTUR, ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2022/01] | English: | PACKAGING STRUCTURE, ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/01] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MISE EN BOÎTIER, VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | Translation filed | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016113107 (WANG TAO [TW], et al); | [A]US2019341332 (LIN YUSHENG [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2006057817 (SONODA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]JP2014060341 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [A]CN104103599 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN104701188 (ADL ENGINEERING INC) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN104882433 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN107785690 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN109755208 (XIAN HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * description paragraphs [0048]-[0084], figures 4-5 *; | [A]CN109755266 (PLAYNITRIDE DIAPLY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document * |