EP4127030 - THE CONTENT OF A BIODEGRADABLE AND COMPOSTABLE, BREATHABLE FILM AND THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF THIS FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PELSAN TEKSTIL URUNLERI SAN. VE TIC. A.S. Osmangazi Mah. Cemil Meric Cad. No:4 34522 Esenyurt/Istanbul / TR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SISMAN, Ali Zafer Osmangazi Mah. Cemil Meric Cad. No:4 34522 Esenyurt/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
CERCI IZMIT, Almila Osmangazi Mah. Cemil Meric Cad. No:4 34522 Esenyurt/Istanbul / TR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Demirkiran, Hasan Kordinat Inovasyon ve Fikri Mulkiyet Yonetimi Ltd. Sti. Nispetiye Mah. Nispetiye Cad. No:6 K:2 Etiler Besiktas 34340 Istanbul / TR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20926811.9 | 07.05.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020TR50395 | Priority number, date | TR20200004607 | 24.03.2020 Original published format: TR 202004607 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021194440 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127030 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L3/02, C08L67/02, C08L67/04, C08K3/26 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08L3/02 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP);
C08J2300/16 (EP);
C08J2367/02 (EP);
C08J2367/04 (EP);
C08J2400/16 (EP);
C08J2403/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L67/02, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L3/02, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08K3/26, C08L3/02, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L3/02, C08L67/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/06] | C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | GEHALT EINES BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN UND KOMPOSTIERBAREN, ATMUNGSAKTIVEN FILMS UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/06] | English: | THE CONTENT OF A BIODEGRADABLE AND COMPOSTABLE, BREATHABLE FILM AND THE PRODUCTION PROCESS OF THIS FILM | [2023/06] | French: | CONTENU D'UN FILM RESPIRANT, BIODÉGRADABLE ET COMPOSTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE FILM | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012315454 (WANG JAMES H [US], et al); | [XYI]CN103627153 (SHANGHAI GENIUS ADVANCED MAT); | [XY]EP2294134 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]US2018127554 (MOHANTY AMAR KUMAR [CA], et al) | International search | [X]US7172814 (HODSON SIMON K [US]) [X] 15-20* Description column 26 line 66-columd 27 line 39 *; | [X]WO2010138081 (HYFLUX LTD [SG], et al) [X] 1,6 * Description page 9 par.3-page 13 par.3 *; | [X]KR20140106882 (ILSHIN CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-14 * Description page 4,claims 1.2 * |