EP4114090 - ROAMING GUIDANCE METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Qikun Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
BAO, Dewei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Fuqing Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
BAI, Xiaofei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 20927152.7 | 31.12.2020 | [2023/01] | WO2020CN142262 | Priority number, date | CN202010229128 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010229128 | [2023/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021190069 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114090 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W36/08, // H04W8/18, H04W8/26, H04W12/08, H04W24/02, H04W48/08, H04W48/20, H04W84/12, H04W8/22 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04W36/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/16 (CN,US);
H04B17/318 (CN);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W48/20 (CN,US);
H04W12/08 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W36/008375 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | ROAMING-FÜHRUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND SYSTEM | [2023/01] | English: | ROAMING GUIDANCE METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE D'ITINÉRANCE, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | Translation filed | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN103945361 (FUJIAN RUIJIE NETWORKS CO LTD); | [X]US2019104463 (KHOURY PETER [US]); | [X]US2019297553 (WANG YUNGUI [CN], et al) |