EP4126532 - SEPARATION SHEET AND USE THEREOF FOR PROVIDING WATERPROOFED STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Qin ROOM 201, NO. 10, LANE 1058, LIANHUA ROAD, MINHANG DISTRICT Shanghai 201100 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Yizhe ROOM 302, NO. 14, LANE 1177, MINGHUA ROAD, SONGJIANG DISTRICT Shanghai 201612 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20928423.1 | 02.04.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN82885 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196107 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126532 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/18 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP);
C09J7/26 (EP,US);
B32B11/044 (EP);
B32B11/046 (EP);
B32B11/048 (EP);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/045 (EP);
B32B25/08 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B25/16 (EP);
B32B25/18 (EP);
B32B25/20 (EP);
B32B27/065 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/22 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP);
C09J133/08 (US);
C09J7/35 (US);
C09J7/38 (EP);
C09J7/385 (US);
C09J7/403 (US);
B32B2266/0228 (EP);
B32B2266/0235 (EP);
B32B2266/025 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2266/08 (EP);
B32B2274/00 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2419/06 (EP);
C09J2203/346 (EP,US);
C09J2301/1242 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (US);
C09J2301/304 (US);
C09J2301/312 (US);
C09J2400/243 (EP);
C09J2423/006 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP);
C09J2495/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J2423/006, C09J2431/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | TRENNFOLIE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG WASSERDICHTER STRUKTUREN | [2023/06] | English: | SEPARATION SHEET AND USE THEREOF FOR PROVIDING WATERPROOFED STRUCTURES | [2023/06] | French: | FEUILLE DE SÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI POUR FOURNIR DES STRUCTURES RENDUES ÉTANCHES À L'EAU | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007081325 (POLYGLASS USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] ** abstract *; | [XAY]DE102010038429 (TESA SE [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0131] * * figure 1; examples 1-4; claim 1 * [A] 11-15 [Y] 8; | [Y]CN110938390 (JIANGSU CANLON BUILDING MAT CO LTD) [Y] 8 * figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]WO2009047984 (LINTEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103890289 (SAINT GOBAIN ADFORS) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN101619198B (TESA SE DE) [X] 1-15 * see claim 1,description from [0019] to [0042]、[0046] to [0099], fig 1 *; | [A]US2015307749 (HOSHI KENTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |