EP4131151 - FINGERPRINT COMPARISON DEVICE, FINGERPRINT COMPARISON METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROKAWA, Akira c/o NEC CORPORATION, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20928613.7 | 30.03.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020JP14507 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021199136 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131151 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06V40/1365 (EP);
G06V40/1376 (US);
G06V10/225 (EP);
G06V10/235 (EP);
G06V10/751 (US);
G06V40/1335 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKVERGLEICHSVORRICHTUNG, FINGERABDRUCKVERGLEICHSVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2023/06] | English: | FINGERPRINT COMPARISON DEVICE, FINGERPRINT COMPARISON METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPARAISON D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES, PROCÉDÉ DE COMPARAISON D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | Translation filed | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 27.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002279427 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2017038695 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0104]-[0147], fig. 13, 21, 23, 30 *; | [A]WO2018198500 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2003173445 |