EP4132130 - TERMINAL, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA, Tomoya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20928624.4 | 02.04.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020JP15252 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021199415 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132130 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H04W56/00, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/06] | English: | TERMINAL, AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/06] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | Translation filed | 29.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2019029597 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al) | International search | [XY]WO2019139140 (SHARP KK [JP]); |