EP4130353 - INDUSTRIAL POLYAMIDE YARN, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cathay Biotech Inc. 4th Floor, Building 5 1690 Cailun Road Zhangjiang Hitech Park Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Cibt America Inc. 200 Continental Drive, Suite 401 Newark DE 19713 / US | For all designated states Cathay (Wusu) Biomaterial Co., Ltd. Magic Zone Chemical Industry Park Wusu Tacheng Area Xinjiang 833000 / CN | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Chaoxu 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road, Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wanzhong 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road, Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Xiang 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road, Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Xiucai 4th Floor, Building 5, 1690 Cailun Road, Zhangjiang Hitech Park, Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20928794.5 | 31.03.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN82600 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196032 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130353 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/60, D01F6/90, D01F1/10, C08G69/26, C08G69/28, D01D5/08, D01D5/088, D01D5/098, D01D5/12, D01D10/02, D01D1/00, D01D5/084 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
C08G69/26 (EP,KR);
D01F6/60 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/28 (KR);
D01D1/00 (EP);
D01D10/02 (EP,KR);
D01D5/082 (US);
D01D5/088 (KR,US);
D01D5/098 (KR,US);
D01D5/12 (EP,KR);
D01F1/10 (KR,US);
D01F6/90 (KR);
D01D5/084 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | D01F6/60, D01F6/90, D01F1/10, C08G69/26, C08G69/28, D01D5/08, D01D5/088, D01D5/098, D01D5/12, D01D10/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | INDUSTRIELLES POLYAMIDGARN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/06] | English: | INDUSTRIAL POLYAMIDE YARN, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND USE THEREOF | [2023/06] | French: | FIL DE POLYAMIDE INDUSTRIEL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | Translation filed | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JP2006144163 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-3* description, embodiment 1 *; | [X]CN106835329 (SHANGHAI CATHAY BIOTECHNOLOGY RES CT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-6, 8-20 * description embodiment 1, paragraphs 0040-0041, 0076 *; | [X]CN106868624 (SHANGHAI CATHAY BIOTECHNOLOGY RES CT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3, 8 * description, embodiment 1 *; | [X]CN109930230 (CATHAY WUSU BIOLOGICAL MAT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 8 * description, embodiment 5 *; | [X]CN110904535 (CATHAY WUSU BIOLOGICAL MAT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 7, 10 * description, embodiment 1 * | by applicant | JP19530000003 |