EP4059228 - ACOUSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518108 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lei Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26, Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 02 /
QI, Xin Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26, Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 03 /
FU, Junjiang Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26, Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Zhen Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26, Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Liwei Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26, Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo, et al Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20929142.6 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020CN128525 | Priority number, date | CN202010247338 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010247338 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196626 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059228 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/28, H04R11/02, H04R25/02 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04R11/02 (EP,KR);
H04R1/1016 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/2803 (US);
H04R1/105 (US);
H04R1/1075 (KR);
H04R1/24 (EP);
H04R1/2834 (EP,KR);
H04R1/345 (US);
H04R25/606 (EP,KR);
H04R7/16 (US);
H04R9/025 (US);
H04R9/06 (US);
H04R2460/13 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | H04R1/10, H04R1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | ACOUSTIC DEVICE | [2022/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2009290730 (FUKUDA MIKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,9,12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figures 3, 4 * [A] 2,3,5,15[I] 8,14; | [XAI]US2017188126 (HIRANO ASAO [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0061]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3,5,15 [I] 8,13,14; | [XAI]WO2019237727 (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,4,9-12 * figures 3, 6, 9, 15 * [A] 2,3,5,15 [I] 8,13,14; | EP3796670 [ ] (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0103] , [ 119] - [0125] - [ 138] - [0139]; figures 3, 6, 9, 15 * |