EP4131857 - SMART HOME MESSAGE NOTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON SMART SCREEN, AND SMART SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Skyworth-Rgb Electronic Co., Ltd 13F-16F, Block A, Skyworth Building Shennan Avenue, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Tao 13F-16F, Block A, Skyworth Building, Shennan Avenue, Yuehai Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20929204.4 | 30.10.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN125540 | Priority number, date | CN202010256668 | 02.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010256668 | [2023/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021196586 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131857 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04W4/021, H04W4/33, H04W4/80 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04L12/282 (EP);
H04L12/2823 (CN,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,CN);
H04W4/33 (EP,CN);
H04W4/80 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | BENACHRICHTIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR INTELLIGENTE HEIMNACHRICHTEN AUF BASIS EINES INTELLIGENTEN BILDSCHIRMS UND INTELLIGENTER BILDSCHIRM | [2023/06] | English: | SMART HOME MESSAGE NOTIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON SMART SCREEN, AND SMART SCREEN | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE NOTIFICATION DE MESSAGE DE DOMICILE INTELLIGENT SUR LA BASE D'UN ÉCRAN INTELLIGENT, ET ÉCRAN INTELLIGENT | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2022 | Translation filed | 28.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2015109104 (FADELL ANTHONY MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2016360344 (SHIM HONGJO [KR], et al); | [IY]WO2018136172 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) |