EP4129809 - STRADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIKYO Yutaka c/o HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD., 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2- chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2024/24] |
Former [2023/06] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20929553.4 | 31.03.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020JP14919 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021199333 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129809 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4129809 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62J27/20, B62J1/28, B62J1/12 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B62J27/20 (EP,US);
B62J1/12 (EP);
B62J1/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | B62J27/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRÄTSCHSITZFAHRZEUG | [2023/06] | English: | STRADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE | [2023/06] | French: | VÉHICULE DU TYPE À ENFOURCHER | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | Translation filed | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 10.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JP2011173566 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2011173566 |