EP4113842 - POWER SUPPLY MODULATOR, AND POWER SUPPLY MODULATION TYPE AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIKI, Kento c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SAKATA, Shuichi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
KOMATSUZAKI, Yuji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
SHINJO, Shintaro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/01] | 01 /
SAIKI, Kento c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKATA, Shuichi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
KOMATSUZAKI, Yuji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
SHINJO, Shintaro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 20929859.5 | 09.04.2020 | [2023/01] | WO2020JP16017 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205614 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113842 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4113842 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/687, H03F1/02, H03F3/20, H03F3/217, H03K17/14 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H03F3/2171 (EP);
H02M3/155 (US);
H02M1/08 (EP);
H03F1/0216 (EP);
H03F3/195 (EP);
H03F3/20 (US);
H03F3/245 (EP);
H03K17/145 (EP);
H03F2200/165 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | H03K17/687, H03F1/02, H03F3/20, H03F3/217 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSMODULATOR UND STROMMODULATIONSTYPVERSTÄRKER | [2023/01] | English: | POWER SUPPLY MODULATOR, AND POWER SUPPLY MODULATION TYPE AMPLIFIER | [2023/01] | French: | MODULATEUR D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET AMPLIFICATEUR DU TYPE À MODULATION D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | Translation filed | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11346120 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4* figures 1,2,4 *; | [A] - SHINTARO SHINJO ET AL, "High speed, high analog bandwidth buck converter using GaN HEMTs for envelope tracking power amplifier applications", WIRELESS SENSORS AND SENSOR NETWORKS (WISNET), 2013 IEEE TOPICAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20130120), doi:10.1109/WISNET.2013.6488618, ISBN 978-1-4673-3104-3, pages 13 - 15, XP032351233 [A] 1-4 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WiSNet.2013.6488618 | International search | [YA]JP2005192302 (KANSAI NIPPON ELECTRIC) [Y] 4, 7 * [0016], 4 [0016], 4 * [A] 3, 5-6; | [A]WO2012046668 (NEC CORP [JP], et al)[A] 3, 5-6; | [YA]JP2014003582 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-2,4,7 * [0012]-[0027], [0039]-[0050], 1-2, 18-20 [0012]-[0027], [0039]-[0050], 1-2, 18-20 * [A] 3, 5-6; | [YA] - SHINJO SHINTARO et al., "High Speed,High Analog Bandwidth Buck Converter Using GaN HEMTs for Envelope Tracking Power Amplifier Applications", 2013 IEEE Topical Conference on Wireless Sensors and Sensor Networks (WiSNet), (20130328), pages 13 - 15, XP032351233 [Y] 1-2,4,7 * , p. 13 16-p. 14 6, Fig. 1 p. 13 16 -p. 14 6, Fig. 1 * [A] 3, 5-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WiSNet.2013.6488618 | by applicant | - S. SHINJO, "High Speed High Analog Bandwidth Buck Converter Using GaN HEMTs for Envelope Tracking Power Amplifier Applications", 2013 IEEE Topical Conference on Wireless Sensors and Sensor Networks |