EP4134940 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/07] | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | ||
[2024/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Pengfei No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
BAI, Lu No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Jie No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Mengqi No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
LI, Huijun No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
HE, Yupeng No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Hao No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
ZHANG, Meng No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
ZHANG, Xin No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20930046.6 | 10.04.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN84246 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203424 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134940 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4134940 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3266, H01L27/12 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
G09G3/3225 (CN,US);
G09G3/32 (CN);
G09G3/3266 (EP,CN);
G09G3/3648 (CN);
G09G3/3677 (CN);
G11C19/28 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/124 (EP);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/124 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
G09G2300/0426 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | G09G3/3266, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT | [2024/17] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE | [2024/17] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/07] | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2023/07] | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | ||
Former [2023/07] | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | Translation filed | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 06.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN104134423 (AU OPTRONICS CORP); | [A]CN105719613 (SHANGHAI TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN110534052 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2019393291 (JEON SANG JIN [KR], et al); | [A]CN110767665 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) |