EP4134183 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CONSTRICTION LIMIT STRAIN OF METAL PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMASHIRO, Fumiaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
SUMIKAWA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
URABE, Masaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20930236.3 | 01.12.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020JP44709 | Priority number, date | JP20200068751 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020068751 | [2023/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205693 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134183 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/00, G01N3/00, G01N3/08 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G01N3/08 (EP,KR,US);
B21D22/30 (KR);
B21C51/00 (US);
B21D24/005 (KR);
B21D53/88 (KR);
G01N3/28 (US);
G01N2203/0017 (EP);
G01N2203/0064 (EP);
G01N2203/027 (EP);
G01N2203/0282 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG DER VERENGUNGSGRENZE EINER METALLPLATTE | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING CONSTRICTION LIMIT STRAIN OF METAL PLATE | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'IDENTIFICATION D'ALLONGEMENT LIMITE DE CONSTRICTION DE PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | Translation filed | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 07.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009177417 (YONEMURA SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [A]JP2019118958 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2020046184 (JFE STEEL CORP); | International search | [A]JP2019118958 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2020046184 (JFE STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2011140046 | JP2014115269 |