EP4133412 - FLEXIBLE RADIO BEACONS AND FLEXIBLE DELIVERY STRUCTURES AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apptricity Corporation Mandalay Tower 1, Suite 400 220 E. Las Colinas Boulevard Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASLAM, Michael, E. 77070 Ledbetter Road Arlington, TX 76001 / US | 02 /
FAROOQUI, Salman 805 Hunters Glen Trail Fort Worth, TX 76120 / US | 03 /
GARCIA, Tim 4920 Rockrimmon Court Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip Palmer Biggs Patents Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield HP9 1LJ / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 20930540.8 | 20.10.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020US56437 | Priority number, date | US202063006586P | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063006586 P | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206753 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133412 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G06K7/10, H04W4/029 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/025 (US);
H01Q1/2208 (US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G06K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE FUNKBAKEN UND FLEXIBLE AUSGABESTRUKTUREN SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/07] | English: | FLEXIBLE RADIO BEACONS AND FLEXIBLE DELIVERY STRUCTURES AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USING | [2023/07] | French: | RADIOPHARES FLEXIBLES ET STRUCTURES DE DISTRIBUTION FLEXIBLES, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019362215 (KHOCHE AJAY [US]) | International search | [Y]US2012070158 (ALLEE DAVID R [US], et al); | [A]US2014291405 (HARKES ERIK JAN [NL]); | [Y]US2017083857 (BARTON JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]JP2018182514 (AIST); | [Y]US2019304278 (LU MIN-HAO MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US5633875 | US6249227 | US6687609 | US6977612 | US7072668 | US7099770 | US7518502 | US2010228585 | US7895131 | US7928844 | US8223009 | US8239251 | US8339251 | US8890683 | US9082102 | US9111433 | US9456302 | US9519921 | US2016379165 | US2017031840 | US9591441 | US9635518 | US9633576 | US9641964 | US2017208426 | US9723552 | US9756684 | US2019362215 |