EP4135428 - PAGING PERIOD ADJUSTING METHOD, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRD COMMUNICATION (SHENZHEN) LTD. 8/F, Block F4 TCL Communication Technology Building TCL International E City No. 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states JRD Communication (Shenzhen) Ltd 8/F Block F4 TCL Communication Technology Building TCL International E City 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Kai 8/F,Block F4, TCL Communication Technology Building, TCL International E City, No. 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Lina 8/F,Block F4, TCL Communication Technology Building, TCL International E City, No. 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Fan 8/F,Block F4, TCL Communication Technology Building, TCL International E City, No. 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | 04 /
LI, Tao 8/F,Block F4, TCL Communication Technology Building, TCL International E City, No. 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20930592.9 | 11.05.2020 | [2023/07] | WO2020CN89564 | Priority number, date | CN202010265687 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010265687 | [2023/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203509 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135428 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00, H04W52/02, H04W72/566 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04W68/005 (EP);
H04W68/00 (CN);
H04W68/02 (CN,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04W68/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER FUNKRUFPERIODE, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHES ENDGERÄT | [2023/07] | English: | PAGING PERIOD ADJUSTING METHOD, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE PÉRIODE DE PAGINATION, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET TERMINAL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2022 | Translation filed | 03.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012122444 (YOON SUNG GUK [KR], et al); | [X]WO2018188481 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2016309446 (KATAGIRI SHINGO [JP]) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [A]CN106060910 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108282803 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 5-6, 11-12, 17-18 * description, paragraphs 34-66 *; | [A]CN108307547 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108616330 (RES INST CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CORP, et al) [Y] 5-6, 11-12, 17-18 * description paragraphs 9-14, 42-43, 67-70, 212-213 *; | [A]CN109451842 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [XY]CN110663285 (QUALCOMM INC) [X] 1-4, 7-10, 13-16 * claims 1-6, description paragraphs 28, 70-71, 76-77, 84-90, figure 10 * [Y] 5-6, 11-12, 17-18; | [XY] - Potevio, "Discussion on DRX enhancements for NR", 3GPP Draft; R2-1700248, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20170117), vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170117 - 20170119, XP051210830 [X] 1-4, 7-10, 13-16 * section 2 * [Y] 5-6, 11-12, 17-18 |