Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023180181 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010265687 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020CN89564 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4135428 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A4 | EP4135428 | 15.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010265687 | 07.04.2020 | WO2020CN89564 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021203509 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010265687 | 07.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111491371 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010265687 | 07.04.2020 |