EP4120622 - DATA VERIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Jianfen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Zhipeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 20931614.0 | 15.04.2020 | [2023/03] | WO2020CN84981 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021207986 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120622 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/40, G06F21/44, H04L9/06, H04W12/03, H04W12/06, H04W12/069, H04W12/106, H04W4/48 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/3263 (US);
G06F21/44 (EP);
H04L63/12 (EP);
H04L9/0643 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/3271 (EP);
H04W12/106 (EP);
H04W4/48 (EP);
H04L2209/805 (EP);
H04L2209/84 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENÜBERPRÜFUNG | [2023/03] | English: | DATA VERIFICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE VÉRIFICATION DE DONNÉES | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | Translation filed | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 31.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3157203 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3,9-11 * figures 3, 5, 8 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0081] *; | [XAI]US2017111177 (OGUMA HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] * [A] 4-7 [I] 3; | [XAI]EP3293659 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 6,7 [I] 2,3,8-11; | [A]US2019028448 (FARRELL BRIAN [US]) [A] 9-11 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [A]CN108248532 (BEIJING ELECTRIC VEHICLE CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]WO2019145488 (NAGRAVISION SA [CH]) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [X]CN110515371 (WEICHAI POWER CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 8-14, 19-25 * description, paragraphs 5-95 * |