EP4139038 - FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TORREFACTION AND CATALYTIC PYROLYSIS OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of British Columbia University Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BI, Xiaotao c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 02 /
LIM, C. Jim c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 03 /
SOKHANSANJ, Shahab c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 04 /
PENG, Jianghong c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 05 /
JIA, Dening c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 06 /
WANG, Ruixu c/o The University of British Columbia University- Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 20931831.0 | 24.04.2020 | [2023/09] | WO2020CA50546 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021212202 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139038 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/24 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B01J8/1818 (EP,US);
B01J8/24 (EP,US);
B01J8/36 (EP);
B01J8/42 (EP,US);
C10B19/00 (EP,US);
C10B47/24 (EP,US);
C10B49/10 (EP,US);
C10B53/02 (EP);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10B57/06 (EP);
C10L5/363 (EP,US);
C10L5/406 (US);
C10L5/44 (US);
C10L9/083 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00327 (EP);
B01J2208/00442 (EP);
C10L2290/02 (EP,US);
C10L2290/06 (EP,US);
C10L2290/08 (EP);
C10L2290/141 (US);
C10L2290/24 (EP);
C10L2290/28 (EP);
C10L2290/30 (EP);
C10L2290/36 (EP);
C10L2290/56 (US);
C10L2290/562 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02P20/143 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | WIRBELSCHICHTREAKTORSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR TORREFIZIERUNG UND KATALYTISCHEN PYROLYSE VON BIOMASSE | [2023/09] | English: | FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TORREFACTION AND CATALYTIC PYROLYSIS OF BIOMASS | [2023/09] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE RÉACTEUR À LIT FLUIDISÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE TORRÉFACTION ET DE PYROLYSE CATALYTIQUE DE BIOMASSE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012285080 (DESPEN DANIEL J [US], et al); | [XI]US2013256113 (TUMIATTI VANDER [IT], et al) | International search | [X]CN102942965 (UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM) | by applicant | US2012285080 | US2013256113 |