EP4121837 - POWER MODE TRANSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAMING, Jeffrey Edward Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-8903 / US | 02 /
MATHIS, Stacie Fowler Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-8903 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Michael Allan Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-8903 / US | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20933063.8 | 28.04.2020 | [2023/04] | WO2020US30219 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021221611 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121837 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/30, G06F1/28, G06F21/81 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G06F1/263 (EP);
G06F1/28 (EP);
G06F1/305 (EP);
G06F1/3206 (EP);
G06F1/3212 (EP);
G06F1/3296 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSMODUSÜBERGANG | [2023/04] | English: | POWER MODE TRANSITION | [2023/04] | French: | TRANSITION DE MODE DE PUISSANCE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5230055 (KATZ NEIL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US5751950 (CRISAN ADRIAN [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US9766678 (MUTHUKARUPPAN RAMNARAYANAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US9893632 (FREEMAN MICHAEL H [US], et al)[A] 1-15 |