EP4137914 - AIR GESTURE-BASED CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yefeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Zhenhua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Wei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
MA, Rui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
SHI, Jia Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20933855.7 | 30.04.2020 | [2023/08] | WO2020CN88219 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217570 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137914 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F1/3231, G06F1/3234, G06F1/3287, G06F3/03, G06F3/04847, G06F3/0482 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,CN);
G06F1/3231 (EP);
G06F1/3265 (EP);
G06F1/3287 (EP);
G06F3/011 (CN);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | LUFTGESTENBASIERTES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE SYSTEM | [2023/08] | English: | AIR GESTURE-BASED CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM | [2023/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE BASÉE SUR UN GESTE DANS L'AIR, ET SYSTÈME | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2022 | Translation filed | 18.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009027337 (HILDRETH EVAN [CA]); | [XAYI]US2014333522 (GOTSCHLICH MARTIN [DE]); | [Y]US2017269696 (NAIDOO JULIAN K [US], et al); | [Y]CN110045819 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | US2022137713 [ ] (HU LIANG [CN], et al) | International search | [X]CN102262438 (MICROSOFT CORPORATION) [X] 1-9, 16-19 * claims 1-15, description paragraphs 31-175 *; | [A]CN102457688 (SICHUAN CHANGHONG ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2013159940 (DUFFY MIKEL [US], et al) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [XY]CN103914126 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-9, 16-19 * description paragraphs 2, 40-77 * [Y] 19; | [X]CN106507201 (LETV HOLDING BEIJING CO LTD , et al) [X] 1-9, 16-19 * description, paragraphs [0044]-[0099] *; | [XY]CN109947249 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 10-15, 16-18 * description paragraphs 2, 53-168 * [Y] 19; | [XY]CN110058682 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 10-15, 16-18 * description paragraphs 3, 50-157 * [Y] 19 |