EP4040491 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, DISPLAY DEVICE AND DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Xiaoyan Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20934263.3 | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020CN88695 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021223086 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040491 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L51/52 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H01L25/167 (EP,KR);
H01L27/1218 (EP,KR);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L27/1237 (KR);
H01L27/124 (EP,KR);
H01L27/1262 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGETAFEL | [2022/32] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, DISPLAY DEVICE AND DISPLAY PANEL | [2022/32] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2022 | Translation filed | 06.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2987165 (CHAJI REZA [CA]); | [A]US2020043400 (CHEN JIA-YUAN [TW], et al) | International search | [A]CN205750219U (XIAMEN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD , et al); | [Y]US2017294463 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al); | [A]CN107403807 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [Y]CN109728188 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD); | [A]CN109949703 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [A]TW201947561 (AU OPTRONICS CORP [TW]) |