EP4044117 - TARGET TRACKING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | ||
For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Xiangbo Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Yuchen Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Hao Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20936648.3 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN117751 | Priority number, date | CN202010443892 | 22.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010443892 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021232652 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044117 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/277, G06T7/246, G06V10/62, G06V10/82, G06V10/74 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
G06V10/62 (EP);
G06T7/277 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06F18/22 (CN,KR);
G06T7/246 (CN,KR);
G06V10/25 (US);
G06V10/443 (US);
G06V10/761 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T2207/20081 (CN,KR,US);
G06T2207/20084 (CN,KR);
G06T2207/30241 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | G06T7/277, G06T7/246, G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | ZIELVERFOLGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/33] | English: | TARGET TRACKING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SUIVI DE CIBLE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 07.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - HSU-KUANG CHIU ET AL, "Probabilistic 3D Multi-Object Tracking for Autonomous Driving", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200116), XP081579951 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 1-3 * | [Y] - LIGANG GE ET AL, "Kalman tracking algorithm for medicine bottle capturing in real-time vision", 2016 IEEE CHINESE GUIDANCE, NAVIGATION AND CONTROL CONFERENCE (CGNCC), IEEE, (20160812), doi:10.1109/CGNCC.2016.7829122, pages 2138 - 2142, XP033049408 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * sections I-III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CGNCC.2016.7829122 |