Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
28.07.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
03.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
13.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.12.2022 | Change - representative | |
16.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.12.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |