EP4148627 - NEURAL NETWORK SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Honghui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shucheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XIONG, Lejin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
NIKITA, Chernega Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 20938103.7 | 29.05.2020 | [2023/11] | WO2020CN93544 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021237755 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148627 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06F9/48, G06F9/50 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06F9/4881 (EP);
G06F9/5016 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | G06N3/063 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | PLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR NEURONALES NETZWERK | [2023/11] | English: | NEURAL NETWORK SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PLANIFICATION DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2022 | Translation filed | 08.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - S. LYM ET AL., "Mini-batch Serialization: CNN Training with Inter-layer Data Reuse", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180930), XP081427919 [X] 1-3,8-10,16 * sections 1 and 3 * [I] 4-7,11-15 | [A] - Y. SHEN ET AL., "Escher: A CNN Accelerator with Flexible Buffering to Minimize Off-Chip Transfer", 2017 IEEE 25TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FIELD-PROGRAMMABLE CUSTOM COMPUTING MACHINES (FCCM), (20170430), doi:10.1109/FCCM.2017.47, pages 93 - 100, XP033113481 [A] 1-16 * sections I and III-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FCCM.2017.47 | [A] - Z. QUE ET AL., "Efficient Weight Reuse for Large LSTMs", 2019 IEEE 30TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON APPLICATION-SPECIFIC SYSTEMS, ARCHITECTURES AND PROCESSORS (ASAP), (20190715), vol. 2160-052X, doi:10.1109/ASAP.2019.00-42, pages 17 - 24, XP033611988 [A] 1-16 * sections III-B, III-C and V-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASAP.2019.00-42 | International search | [X]CN107454965 (GOOGLE INC) [X] 1-25 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0066], and figure 6 *; | [A]CN110058943 (SAMSUNG CHINA SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]US2019303762 (SUI LINGZHI [CN], et al) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [A]CN110447044 (GOOGLE LLC) [A] 1-25 * entire document * |