EP4161473 - USE OF A COMPOUND CONTAINING TWO OR MORE ALCOHOLIC HYDROXYL GROUPS OR PHENOLIC HYDROXYL GROUPS AS A MICROBIOME REGULATOR ON SCALP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Yi Shanghai 200433 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Mengmeng Shanghai 200333 / CN | 03 /
CHANG, Xiaowei Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 20939406.3 | 05.06.2020 | [2023/15] | WO2020CN94505 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021243669 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161473 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/30, A61K8/34, A61Q5/00, G01N33/50, A61K8/35 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61Q5/006 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP);
C12Q1/025 (EP);
A61K2800/5922 (EP);
C12R2001/45 (EP);
G01N2500/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | A61K8/02, A61K8/30, A61K8/34, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER VERBINDUNG MIT ZWEI ODER MEHR ALKOHOLISCHEN HYDROXYLGRUPPEN ODER PHENOLISCHEN HYDROXYLGRUPPEN ALS MIKROBIOMREGULATOR AUF DER KOPFHAUT | [2023/15] | English: | USE OF A COMPOUND CONTAINING TWO OR MORE ALCOHOLIC HYDROXYL GROUPS OR PHENOLIC HYDROXYL GROUPS AS A MICROBIOME REGULATOR ON SCALP | [2023/15] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN COMPOSÉ CONTENANT DEUX OU PLUSIEURS GROUPES HYDROXYLE ALCOOLIQUES OU GROUPES HYDROXYLE PHÉNOLIQUES EN TANT QUE RÉGULATEUR DU MICROBIOME SUR LE CUIR CHEVELU | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CA2307614 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [I] 6* the whole document *; | [I]EP2807925 (SYMRISE AG [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0111]; claims 1,2 *; | [XI] - anonymous, "Ultra Strong Silver Shampoo", GNPD, MINTEL, (20180406), Database accession no. 5581147, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/5581147/, XP093107721 [X] 7-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 10 | [XI] - anonymous, "Dandruff Shampoo Formula for Men", GNPD, MINTEL, (20171004), Database accession no. 5140231, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/5140231/, XP093107722 [X] 7-9,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 10 | [I] - KINNUNEN T ET AL, "ANTIBACTERIAL AND ANTIFUNGAL PROPERTIES OF PROPYLENE GLYCOL, HEXYLENE GLYCOL, AND 1,3-BUTYLENE GLYCOL IN VITRO", ACTA DERMATO-VENEREOLOGICA, TAYLOR & FRANCIS LTD, UNITED KINGDOM, (19910101), vol. 71, no. 2, ISSN 0001-5555, pages 148 - 150, XP000670892 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * | [I] - KUM H ET AL, "Evaluation of anti-acne properties of phloretin in vitro and in vivo", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (20150830), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1111/ICS.12263, ISSN 0142-5463, pages 85 - 92, XP071470194 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/ics.12263 | International search | [X]CN103494713 (GUANGDONG IND TECH COLLEGE) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraphs [0004]-[0011],[0029]-[0038] *; | [X]CN103767884 (BEIJING SUNPU BIOCHEMISTRY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraphs [0010]-[0020],[0025]-[0067] *; | [X]CN103936606 (UNIV SHAANXI NORMAL) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraph [0002] *; | [XY]CN105228449 (SYMRISE AG) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraphs [0016]-[0019],[0034],[0038],[0114] * [Y] 1-15; | [X]CN108888541 (GUANGZHOU XINSHENG MEDICINE MAT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraphs [0003]-[0022] *; | [X]CN109475120 (SYMRISE AG) [X] 1-15 * description,paragraphs [0048]-[0171],[0375] *; | [Y] - H. Kum, K.-B. Roh, S. Shin, K. Jung, D. Park, E. Jung, "Evaluation of anti-acne properties of phloretin in vitro and in vivo", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE., KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT., NL, NL , (20160201), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1111/ics.12263, ISSN 0142-5463, pages 85 - 92, XP055483960 [Y] 1-15 * pages 1-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/ics.12263 | [X] - Kunlayakorn Lawan, Mayuree Kanlayavattanakul, Nattaya Lourith, "Antimicrobial efficacy of caprylyl glycol and ethylhexylglycerine in emulsion", Journal of Health Research, Journal of Health Research , College of Public Health Sciences, Chulalongkorn University., TH, TH , (20090101), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 0857-4421, pages 1 - 3, XP008160700 [X] 1-15 * pages 1-3 * |