EP4144307 - THROMBUS TREATMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Venmed Technology Co., Ltd. 2nd Floor of the South Building 11 No. 8 Jinfeng Road Science&Technology Town, National Hi-Tech District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215163 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yonggang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215163 / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Lijuan Suzhou, Jiangsu 215163 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jing Suzhou, Jiangsu 215163 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Fidal Innovation 4-6 avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 20939958.3 | 25.12.2020 | [2023/10] | WO2020CN139595 | Priority number, date | CN202010534497 | 12.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010534497 | [2023/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021248878 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144307 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/221, A61B17/3207, A61F2/01 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP);
A61B17/22 (CN);
A61B17/320758 (EP,US);
A61B17/22012 (EP);
A61B17/2202 (EP);
A61B17/320725 (EP,US);
A61F2/013 (EP);
A61B2017/22074 (US);
A61B2017/22078 (US);
A61B2017/22079 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22081 (CN);
A61B2017/22084 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | A61B17/22, A61B17/221 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | THROMBUSBEHANDLUNGSPLATTFORM | [2023/10] | English: | THROMBUS TREATMENT PLATFORM | [2023/10] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE TRAITEMENT DE THROMBUS | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2022 | Translation filed | 30.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002010487 (EVANS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0094]; figures 1-26 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]US2016120565 (KOBAYASHI JUNICHI [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0103] - [0199]; figures 1-34 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP3505110 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0031] - [0055]; figures 1-24 *[I] 2-15 |