EP3992408 - SYNCHRONOUS SLIDING MECHANISM, SIDE HIDDEN DOOR SYSTEM, AND CABINET BODY WITH SIDE HIDDEN DOOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/18] | SYNCHRONIZED SLIDE MECHANISM, SIDE CONCEALING DOOR SYSTEM, AND CABINET BODY HAVING SIDE CONCEALING DOOR SYSTEM | ||
[2024/36] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZHONGSHAN OPIKE HARDWARE PRODUCTS CO., LTD No. 11 Ruihe Road Yongning Luosha District Xiaolan Town, Zhongshan Guangdong 528403 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Jiangde Xiaolan Town, Zhongshan Guangdong 528403 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20940876.4 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN103729 | Priority number, date | CN202010544080 | 15.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010544080 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021253569 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992408 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3992408 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/50, E05D15/58, E06B5/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
E05D15/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E06B5/006 (CN,KR,US);
E05D15/44 (US);
E05D15/581 (US);
E06B3/4663 (EP,US);
E06B3/5072 (US);
E06B3/509 (CN,KR,US);
E05D15/0686 (US);
E05Y2201/60 (EP,KR);
E05Y2201/62 (EP,KR);
E05Y2201/624 (EP,KR,US);
E05Y2201/684 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNCHRONER SCHIEBEMECHANISMUS, SEITLICH VERDECKTES TÜRSYSTEM UND SCHRANKKORPUS MIT SEITLICH VERDECKTEM TÜRSYSTEM | [2024/36] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS SLIDING MECHANISM, SIDE HIDDEN DOOR SYSTEM, AND CABINET BODY WITH SIDE HIDDEN DOOR SYSTEM | [2024/36] | French: | MÉCANISME COULISSANT SYNCHRONE, SYSTÈME DE PORTES À FERMETURE LATÉRALE ET ARMOIRE AVEC SYSTÈME DE PORTES À FERMETURE LATÉRALE | [2024/36] |
Former [2022/18] | SYNCHRONISIERTER SCHIEBEMECHANISMUS, SEITENVERDECKUNGSTÜRSYSTEM UND SCHRANKKÖRPER MIT EINEM SEITENVERDECKUNGSTÜRSYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/18] | SYNCHRONIZED SLIDE MECHANISM, SIDE CONCEALING DOOR SYSTEM, AND CABINET BODY HAVING SIDE CONCEALING DOOR SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/18] | MÉCANISME DE COULISSEMENT SYNCHRONISÉ, SYSTÈME DE PORTE ESCAMOTABLE LATÉRALEMENT ET CORPS DE MEUBLE COMPORTANT UN SYSTÈME DE PORTE ESCAMOTABLE LATÉRALEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | Translation filed | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5149180 (HAAB KARL [CH], et al); | [A]US9894996 (GRELA LARRY MITCHELL [US], et al); | [A]CN207485245U (JIANGXI ZHONGXIANG ENERGY SAVING DOOR AND WINDOW DECORATION CO LTD) |