EP4173773 - ROBOT TEACHING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TEACHING WORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | For all designated states HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Masahiro Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 02 /
OGAWARA, Shogo Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Shinichi Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Tomohiro Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 20941533.0 | 25.06.2020 | [2023/18] | WO2020JP25077 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021260898 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173773 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, G05B19/42, B25J9/22 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/42 (EP);
B25J9/1664 (EP,US);
B25J9/0081 (US);
G05B2219/35444 (EP);
G05B2219/36442 (EP);
G05B2219/40391 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | B25J9/22, G05B19/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | ROBOTERLEHRVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LEHREN VON ARBEITEN | [2023/18] | English: | ROBOT TEACHING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TEACHING WORK | [2023/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENSEIGNEMENT DE ROBOT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENSEIGNEMENT DE TRAVAIL | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | Translation filed | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004172168 (WATANABE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 11-13,19 * paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2015277430 (LINNELL JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 11-13,19 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0097] *; | [IA]US2018021956 (ATHERTON EVAN PATRICK [US], et al) [I] 19 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 1-6,8-18; | [IA]US2019321983 (CHEN WENJIE [JP], et al) [I] 19 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 1-6,8-18 | International search | [A]JPS6038417B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2002120174 (SONY CORP) [Y] 14-18 * fig. 29-34 *; | [Y]JP2011131326 (IHI AEROSPACE CO LTD, et al) [Y] 7-10, 13, 18 * claims *; | [Y]JP2012528015 (ALDEBARAN ROBOTICS) [Y] 14-18 * fig. 6, 9-10 *; | [Y]JP2014117781 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 14-18 * paragraphs [0011]-[0139], fig. 1-16 *; | [XY]JP2015071206 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033]-[0120], fig. 1-11 paragraphs [0033]-[0120], fig. 1-11 * [Y] 7-18; | [Y]WO2015137167 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 7-13, 18 * in particular, paragraphs [0059]-[0072] *; | [A]JP2016010824 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-18* entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2018069366 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 14-18 * paragraphs [0017]-[0057], fig. 1, 3-6 *; | [Y]JP2018167361 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 14-18 * paragraphs [0026]-[0164], fig. 1, 3-15 *; | [Y]WO2019092792 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * in particular, paragraphs [0080]-[0112], fig. 17-20 *; | [Y] - Terada, Koji et al., "Mobile gripping robot HSR-2015 utilizing a small degree-of-freedom arm and an omnidirectional trolley", The 33rd Annual Conference of the Robotics Society of Japan; Tokyo, Japan; September 3-5, 2015, jp, (20150903), vol. 33, pages 1 - 4, XP009541555 [Y] 7-10, 13, 18 | by applicant | JP6038417B |